Senate | 04/13/2022 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Waldron | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Wolfley |