Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3702 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022