Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 8
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Murdock
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Leewright
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Rogers, Paxton, Leewright, Taylor, Rosino, Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley, McDugle
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Fetgatter
|
|
|