Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3734 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 28, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2022
Bill April 13, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022