Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Leewright, Paxton, Taylor, Rosino, Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Fetgatter
|
|
|