House
|
05/02/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Amendment restored bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Newton
|
|
|