LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Oklahoma OK
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB3821
Draft Versions
OK
Oklahoma House Bill HB3821
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session
Oklahoma House Bill HB3821
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 20, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 22, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 27, 2022
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 14, 2022
Compare
Bill
March 2, 2022
Compare