Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3848 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/20/2022

                             
 
Req. No. 10256 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) 
 
HOUSE BILL 3848 	By: Blancett 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to state government; creating the 
Pre-trial Data Collection Act; requiring certain 
entities to collect specific data; p roviding certain 
reporting requirements to the Office of Management 
and Enterprise Services; providing for publication of 
certain datasets; requiring certain public format; 
specifying certain submission dates; providing for 
certain publication date; provid ing certain action 
for noncompliance; providing for codification; and 
providing an effective date . 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 81.2 of Title 74, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  This act shall be know n and may be cited as the "Pre-trial 
Data Collection Act". 
B. Beginning January 1, 2023, an entity required to collect 
data in accordance with this section shall collect the specified 
data required of the entity on a monthly basis.  Each entity shall 
report the data collected in acco rdance with this subsection to the 
Office of Management and Enterprise Services on a month ly basis.   
 
Req. No. 10256 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
C.  The Office of Management and Enterprise Services shall 
publish datasets in its possession in a modern, open, electronic 
format that is machine -readable and readily accessible by the public 
on the website of the agency. The published data shall be 
searchable, at a minimum, by each data element, county, circuit, and 
unique identifier. Agencies that employ five hundred (500) or more 
employees shall submit data by July 1, 2023. Agencies that employ 
more than one hundred (100) but less than five hundred (500) 
employees shall submit data by December 31 , 2023. Agencies with 
more than zero (0) and less than one hundred (100) employees shall 
submit data by July 1, 2024. Beginning January 1, 2023, the Office 
of Management and Enterprise Services sha ll begin publishing the 
data received in the same modern, open, electronic format that is 
machine-readable and readily accessible to the public on the website 
of the Office of Management and Enterprise S ervices. 
D.  Upon a determination by the Office of Management and 
Enterprise Services of noncompliance, any member of any board of 
county commissioners may bring an action in a district court having 
jurisdiction over the county from which the county commissioner 
serves to force compliance. If any entity covered under the 
provision of this act encompasses more than one county, upon a 
determination by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services of 
noncompliance, a county commissioner serving from any of the   
 
Req. No. 10256 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
entity's encompassed counties may bring such act ion against the 
entity. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall be come effective November 1, 2022. 
 
58-2-10256 GRS 01/20/22