Senate | 04/11/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Strom |