Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Referred to General Government | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Strom |