House
|
05/18/2022
|
Remove Senator Coleman as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator David
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Remove Representative Lepak as principal House author and substitute with Representative Miller
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Conference granted, GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Quinn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Quinn; authored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Nollan
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Lepak
|
|
|