House
|
05/05/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Remove Representative Lawson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Phillips
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Lawson
|
|
|