House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Montgomery, Paxton, Pederson, Taylor, Rader, Hall, Floyd, Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Utilities
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Utilities Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Utilities
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Pfeiffer
|
|
|