Senate | 03/31/2022 | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 13 | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Kannady |