House
|
05/04/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/04/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Pfeiffer
|
|
|