Senate | 04/13/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Wallace |