House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Conference granted, GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Jech
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Dempsey
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Wallace
|
|
|