House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Blancett, Munson
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services sub-committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Rosecrants
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator David
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Quinn, Bergstrom
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Mize, Moore, Burns, Dobrinski, Humphrey, Strom, Newton, Culver, Pfeiffer, Kendrix, Sneed, Patzkowsky, Luttrell, West (Josh)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Frix
|
|
|