LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Oklahoma OK
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB4099
Draft Versions
OK
Oklahoma House Bill HB4099
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session
Oklahoma House Bill HB4099
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 20, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 26, 2022
Compare
Bill
March 15, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 20, 2022
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 7, 2022
Compare
Bill
March 2, 2022
Compare