House
|
05/18/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/18/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Frix
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Vancuren
|
|
|