Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 14
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named David, Dugger, Weaver, Rosino, Hall, Floyd
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Efficiency
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 35 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Notice served to reconsider vote on measure David
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Measure failed: Ayes: 23 Nays: 18
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Efficiency
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Echols
|
|
|