Senate | 04/05/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 5 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nollan | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Echols |