House
|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Virgin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Russ
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Bush
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Boatman
|
|
|