House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/25/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator David, Garvin, Hall, Jech, Kidd, Leewright, Murdock, Pemberton, Rader, Rosino, Simpson, Standridge, Stanley, Stephens, Taylor, Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Stearman
|
|
|