House | 03/24/2022 | Returned to General Order | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 60 Nays: 20 | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 52 | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Sneed | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | First Reading |