House
|
05/16/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Third Reading rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Baker, McDugle, Phillips, Dollens
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Hill
|
|
|