Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Authored by Senator Pederson (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Referred to Transportation | ||
House | 02/21/2022 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Remove Representative Hill as principal House author and substitute with Representative Patzkowsky | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Representative Hill |