House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 30 Nays: 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 17; Ayes: 68 Nays: 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Pugh, Pemberton, Stanley, Taylor, Newhouse, Dossett (J.J.), Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Emergency failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Baker
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Remove Representative Baker as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hilbert
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Baker
|
|
|