Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4389 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022