Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4390 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill February 21, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2022