Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4412 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 14, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 4, 2022