Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4449 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/20/2022

                            An Act 
ENROLLED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 4449 	By: Wallace and Martinez of the 
House 
 
   and 
 
  Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Military Department; 
creating the Military Justice Revolving Fund; 
establishing nature of fund; d eclaring funds 
appropriated; authorizing expenditure for certain 
purpose; providing budgetin g and expenditure 
requirements and limitatio ns; amending 74 O.S. 2021, 
Section 9030.5, which relates to art in public 
places; exempting the Oklahoma Mili tary Department 
from certain art allocation requirement; updating 
statutory outline; providing for codification; 
providing an effective date; and declaring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT: Oklahoma Military Department 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLA HOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 233.14 of Title 44, unless there 
is created a duplica tion in numbering, reads as follows: 
 
There is hereby created in the State Treasu ry a revolving fund 
for the Oklahoma Military Department to be designated the "Military 
Justice Revolving Fund".  The fund shall be a continuing fund, not 
subject to fiscal ye ar limitations, and shall consist of all monies 
directed for deposit to the fund by law.  All monies accruing to the 
credit of said fund are hereby appropriated and may be budgeted and 
expended by the Oklahoma Military Department for the purpose of  ENR. H. B. NO. 4449 	Page 2 
prosecuting military misconduct as needed.  Expenditures from said 
fund shall be made up on warrants issued by the State Treasure r 
against claims filed as prescribed by law with the Director of the 
Office of Management an d Enterprise Services for approval and 
payment. 
 
SECTION 2.     AMENDATORY     74 O.S. 2021, Section 9030. 5, is 
amended to read as follows: 
 
Section 9030.5 A.  1.  Except as otherwise provided by 
subsection C of this section, all state age ncies, including 
institutions within The Oklahoma State System of Higher Education, 
all state departments, board s, councils, and commissions shall 
allocate, as a nondeductible item out of any expenditures for 
capital projects including, but not limited to, bond issues for 
state construction excluding costs for bond issuance and related 
reserves, an amount of one and one-half percent (1 1/2%) of the 
expenditure to the Oklahoma Arts Counci l for the purpose of funding 
the Oklahoma Art in Public Places Act, exc ept as otherwise prov ided 
by subsection B of this section. 
 
2.  The maximum assessment for any project shall not exceed Five 
Hundred Thousand Dollars ($500,000.00) .  This assessment shall not 
apply to any private donations for a capital project .  This 
allocation shall be applic able to all state agency capital projects 
approved by the appointing authority after Septem ber 1, 2004.  The 
works of art commissioned pursuant to the Oklahoma Art in Public 
Places Act may be placed on public lands, integral to or atta ched to 
a public building or structure, or detached within or outside a 
public building or structure. 
 
B.  1.  Of the assessment provided for in subsection A of this 
section, four-fifths (4/5) shall be placed in the Commissioning of 
Art in Public Places Rev olving Fund, created in Section 9030.6 of 
this title, for the commission of any work of art for the Oklahoma 
Art in Public Places Act.  Institutions within The Okla homa State 
System of Higher Education shall remain in complete administrative 
control of their four-fifths (4/5) assessment pursuant to this 
subsection for the acquisition of art.  The remaining one-fifth 
(1/5) of the assessment shall be reserved for the A rt in Public 
Places Administrative and Maintenance Revolving Fund created by 
Section 9030.7 of this title. 
 
2.  Monies deposited in the Art in Public Places Administrative 
and Maintenance Revolving Fund fo r the purpose of this moratorium  ENR. H. B. NO. 4449 	Page 3 
shall be used for continued administration, educational costs and 
maintenance. 
 
C.  The provisions of subsection A of this section shall not be 
applicable: 
 
1. For the fiscal years ending: 
 
a. June 30, 2012, 
 
b. June 30, 2013, and 
 
c. June 30, 2014; and 
 
2.  To the following: 
 
a. the Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department, and 
 
b. the Oklahoma Military Department . 
 
SECTION 3.  This act shall beco me effective July 1, 2022. 
 
SECTION 4.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 4449 	Page 4 
Passed the House of Repre sentatives the 18th day of May, 2022. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the 20th day of May, 2022. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this _____ _______________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________