House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
JCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Direct to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Authored by Representative Wallace, Martinez
|
|
|