House | 05/26/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2022 | ||
House | 05/20/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/20/2022 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | ||
House | 05/20/2022 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 05/20/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/20/2022 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | ||
Senate | 05/20/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2022 | JCR adopted | ||
Senate | 05/19/2022 | Direct to Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 05/18/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 05/18/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 6 | ||
House | 05/18/2022 | General Order | ||
Senate | 05/18/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 05/17/2022 | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Authored by Representative Wallace, Martinez |