Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4468 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/20/2022

                            An Act 
ENROLLED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 4468 	By: Wallace and Martinez of the 
House 
 
   and 
 
  Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Center for the 
Advancement of Science and Technology; requiring that 
portions of certain appr opriated funds be utilized 
for certain purposes; providing budgeting and 
expenditure limitations and procedures; providing 
lapse date; and requiring and prohibiting certain 
budget procedures. 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT: Oklahoma Center for the Advancemen t of Science and 
Technology 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma Center 
for the Advancement of Scien ce and Technology in Enrolled Senate 
Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, 
One Million Eight Hundred Thousand Dollars ($1,800,000.00) shall be 
allocated to the Oklahoma Manufacturing Alliance for the purpose of 
Industrial Extension Services. 
 
SECTION 2.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma Center 
for the Advancement of Science and Technology in Enrolled Senate 
Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of t he 58th Oklahoma Legislature, 
Two Hundred Eighty-two Thousand Dollars ($282,000.00) shall be 
allocated to the Oklahoma Small Business Research Assistance. 
 
SECTION 3. From the funds appropriated to the Okl ahoma Center 
for the Advancement of Science and Tech nology in Enrolled Senate  ENR. H. B. NO. 4468 	Page 2 
Bill No. 1040 of the 2nd Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, 
Four Hundred Fifty Thousand Dollars ($450,000.00) shall be allocated 
to the Inventors Assistance Services . 
 
SECTION 4.  Appropriations mad e by this act, not including 
appropriations made for capital outlay purposes, may be budgeted for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY-23) or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024 (hereafter FY-24).  
Funds budgeted for FY-23 may be encumbered only through J une 30, 
2023, and must be expended by November 15, 2023.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2023, and not budgeted for FY-24, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fu nd for the then current fiscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY-24 may be encumbered on ly through June 
30, 2024.  Any funds remaining after November 15, 2024, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.  
These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY-23, and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY-24, after 
the agency to which t he funds have been appropriated has prepa red 
and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds 
from the FY-23 budget work program and after such revision has been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 4468 	Page 3 
Passed the House of Representatives the 18th day of May, 2022. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the 20th day of May, 2022. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________