Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB4468 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2022

                     
 
Req. No. 11594 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
HOUSE BILL NO. 4468 	By: Wallace and Martinez of the 
House 
 
   and 
 
  Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Center for the 
Advancement of Science and Technology; requiring that 
portions of certain appr opriated funds be utilized 
for certain purposes; providing budgeting and 
expenditure limitations and procedures; providing 
lapse date; requiring and prohibiting certain budget 
procedures; and providing for noncodification . 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law not to be 
codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: 
From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma Center for the 
Advancement of Scien ce and Technology in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 
1040 of the 2nd Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, One 
Million Eight Hundred Thousand Dollars ($1,800,000.00) shall be   
 
Req. No. 11594 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
allocated to the Oklahoma Manufacturing Alliance for the purpose of 
Industrial Extension Services. 
SECTION 2.     NEW LAW     A new section of law not to be 
codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: 
From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma Center for the 
Advancement of Science and Technology i n Enrolled Senate Bill No. 
1040 of the 2nd Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, Two 
Hundred Eighty-two Thousand Dollars ($282,000.00) shall be allocated 
to the Oklahoma Small Business Research Assistance. 
SECTION 3.     NEW LAW     A new section of law not to be 
codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: 
From the funds appropriated to the Okl ahoma Center for the 
Advancement of Science and Technology in Enrolled Senate Bill No. 
1040 of the 2nd Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, Four 
Hundred Fifty Thousand Dollars ($450,000.00) shall be allocated to 
the Inventors Assistance Services . 
SECTION 4.  Appropriations mad e by this act, not including 
appropriations made for capital outlay purposes, may be budgeted for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY-23) or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024 (hereafter FY-24).  
Funds budgeted for FY-23 may be encumbered only through J une 30, 
2023, and must be expended by November 15, 2023.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2023, and not budgeted for FY-24, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fu nd for the then current fiscal   
 
Req. No. 11594 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
year.  Funds budgeted for FY-24 may be encumbered on ly through June 
30, 2024.  Any funds remaining after November 15, 2024, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.  
These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY-23, and not required to pay 
obligations for that fi scal year, may be budgeted for FY-24, after 
the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepa red 
and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds 
from the FY-23 budget work program and after such revision has been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. 
 
58-2-11594 JM 05/17/22