Senate | 04/19/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/19/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Davis (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Stanley |