Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB102 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/07/2020

                             
 
 
Req. No. 290 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
SENATE BILL 102 	By: Haste 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to public finance; defining terms; 
requiring certain state agencies to report certain 
information; requiring the Office of Management and 
Enterprise Services to submit certain report; 
providing for codification; providing an effective 
date; and declaring an emergency . 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OK LAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 34.204 of Title 62, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  As used in this section: 
1.  "State agencies that provide, contract for, or otherwise 
fund mental health services" includes: 
a. the Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse 
Services, 
b. the State Department of Health , 
c. the Oklahoma Health Care Authority, 
d. the Department of Human Services, 
e. the Oklahoma Department of Veterans Affair s,   
 
 
Req. No. 290 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
f. the State Department of Education , 
g. the Oklahoma Department of Career and Techn ology 
Education, 
h. The Oklahoma State System of Higher Education , 
i. the Department of Corrections, 
j. the Insurance Department of the State of Oklahoma , and 
k. the Office of Juvenile Affairs ; and 
2.  "Mental health services" means programs or services directly 
or indirectly related to the research, prevention or detection of 
mental health and substance use pr oblems, and all services necessary 
to treat, care for, control, supervise and rehabilitate persons with 
mental illness and substance use disorders . 
B.  On or before September 30, 2021, all state agencies that 
provide, contract for, or otherwise fund mental health services 
shall report to the Office of Management and Enterprise Services 
(OMES): 
1.  All mental health services provided by the agency.  The 
name, purpose and primary funding source or sources of each service 
shall be included; 
2.  A financial summary of spending amounts by meth od of finance 
associated with each program.  The financial summary shall include 
annual spending on each se rvice in each of the last five (5) state 
fiscal years; and   
 
 
Req. No. 290 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
3.  Outcome summaries for mental health services.  Summaries 
shall include target population or populations, numbers served and 
relevant metrics associated with the performance of the program. 
C.  On or before November 30, 2021, OMES shall compile agency 
reports and submit a unified report to the President Pro Tempore of 
the Senate, the Speaker of t he House of Representatives, the 
Legislative Office of Fiscal Transparency and the Governor, and make 
the report available to the public.  The unified report shall 
coherently organize and display agency informati on and provide a 
summary of statewide spendi ng by agency and type of service. 
D.  The Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services 
shall provide technical assistance to the agencies and OMES as 
necessary for the compilation of this report. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall becom e effective July 1, 2021. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservat ion 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereb y 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this ac t shall take effect and 
be in full force fro m and after its passage and approval. 
 
58-1-290 DC 12/7/2020 4:31:44 PM