Senate | 04/20/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/20/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 14 | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Murdock | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Leewright | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2021 | Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Energy | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Montgomery | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator David |