Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
Filed with Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2022
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 70 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2022
|
Veto override message received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
Measure sent to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2022
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 34 Nays: 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Sections 1 and 2 in their entireties
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Line item vetoed 05/26/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 12
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
JCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Hilbert
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Authored by Senator Thompson
|
|
|