Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1054 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/20/2021

                             
 
 
An Act 
ENROLLED SENATE 
BILL NO. 1054 	By: Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Wallace and Hilbert of the 
House 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Department of Public Safety; 
authorizing certain expenditures for certain 
purposes; authorizing the Departmen t of Public Safety 
to hold additional trooper academies subject to 
available funding; authori zing use of certain 
revolving fund; providing lapse dates; and requiring 
and prohibiting certain budget procedures. 
 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT:  Department of Public Safety 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.  From the funds appropriated to the Department of 
Public Safety in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of 
the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the Department of Public Safety is 
hereby authorized to expe nd Four Hundred Thirty-nine Thousand One 
Hundred Twenty Dollars ($439,120.00) for any necessary expenditures 
related to interoperable communications inside the State Capitol 
Building. 
 
SECTION 2.  From the funds approp riated to the Departmen t of 
Public Safety in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of 
the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the Department of Public Safety is 
hereby authorized to expend Four Million Dollars ($4,000,000.00) to 
hold a trooper academy . Subject to available fun ding, the 
Department is authorized to hold addition al academies.   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 1054 	Page 2 
 
SECTION 3.  Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the 
Department of Public Safety is hereby authorized to utilize the 
Department of Public Safety Restricted Revolving Fu nd (245 Fund), as 
may be necessary to perform the d uties imposed upon the Department 
of Public Safety by law . 
 
SECTION 4.  Appropriations ma de by this act, not including 
appropriations made for capital outlay purpose s, may be budgeted for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022 (hereafter FY -22), or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY -23).  
Funds budgeted for FY -22 may be encumbered only through June 30, 
2022, and must be expended by No vember 15, 2022.  Any fun ds 
remaining after November 15, 2022, and not bud geted for FY-23, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY-23 may be encumbered only through June 
30, 2023.  Any funds rem aining after November 15, 2023, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fu nd for the then current fiscal year.  
These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY -22, and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY-23, after 
the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work program revision removing these fun ds 
from the FY-22 budget work program and after such revision has been 
approved by the Office of Mana gement and Enterprise Services. 
   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 1054 	Page 3 
Passed the Senate the 18th day of May, 2021. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
Passed the House of Representatives the 20th day of May, 2021. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this _______ _____________ 
day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _______________________________ __ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _________ 
day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this _______ ___ 
day of __________________, 20 _______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _______________________________ __