Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1056 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/20/2022

                             
 
 
An Act 
ENROLLED SENATE 
BILL NO. 1056 	By: Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Wallace and Martinez of the 
House 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma State Bureau of 
Narcotics and Dangerous Drugs Control; making an 
appropriation; stating purpose; providing lapse 
dates; and requiring an d prohibiting certain budget 
procedures. 
 
 
 
SUBJECT:  Oklahoma State Bureau of Narcotics and Dangerous Drugs 
Control 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.  There is hereby appropriated to the Oklahoma State 
Bureau of Narcotics and Dangerous Drugs Control from any monies not 
otherwise appropriated f rom the General Revenue Fund of the State 
Treasury for the fiscal yea r ending June 30, 2023, the sum of Five 
Million Three Hundred Thousand Dollars ($5,300,000.00) or so much 
thereof as may be nec essary to enhance the operation of the 
Marijuana Enforcement Teams. 
 
SECTION 2.  Appropriations made by this act, not including 
appropriations made for capital outlay purposes, may be b udgeted for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY-23), or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024 (hereafter FY-24).  
Funds budgeted for FY-23 may be encumbered only through June 30, 
2023, and must be expended by November 15, 2023.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2023, and not budgeted for FY-24, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY-24 may be encumbered only through June   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 1056 	Page 2 
30, 2024.  Any funds remaining afte r November 15, 2024, shall lapse 
to the credit of the pr oper fund for the then current fiscal year.  
These appropriations ma y not be budgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY-23, and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY-24, after 
the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds 
from the FY-23 budget work program and after such revision has been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services . 
   
 
ENR. S. B. NO. 1056 	Page 3 
Passed the Senate the 18th day of May, 2022. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
Passed the House of Representatives the 20th day of May, 2022. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this _______ _____________ 
day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _______________________________ __ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _____ ____ 
day of _________________ __, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this _______ ___ 
day of __________________, 20 _______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _______________________________ __