Senate | 05/26/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2022 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/20/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/20/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 05/20/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
House | 05/20/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 5 | ||
House | 05/20/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 05/20/2022 | JCR adopted | ||
House | 05/19/2022 | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
Senate | 05/18/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 05/18/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 05/18/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Emergency removed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Hall | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Authored by Senator Thompson |