Senate | 03/14/2022 | Approved by Governor 03/14/2022 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 7 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | JCR adopted | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 11 | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Hall | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Authored by Senator Thompson |