House | 04/14/2022 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Stephens | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 11 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 03/03/2022 | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Withdrawn from General Government committee | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Dahm |