House | 04/06/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |