Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1097 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 09/17/2021

                             
 
 
Req. No. 2296 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) 
 
SENATE BILL 1097 	By: Dahm 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to schools; directing the State 
Department of Education to implement a f our-year 
pilot program beginning in certain school year to 
provide courses and assessments on certain subjects 
to certain students; directing the Department to 
contract with certain provider; requiring certain 
courses to be made available; requiring 
administration of certain assessment; req uiring 
submission of assessment scores; requiring the 
Department to post certain scores on its website in 
certain manner; requiring p ilot program end by 
certain date; requiring sub mission of report by 
certain date; provid ing for contents of report; 
providing for promulga tion of rules; providing for 
codification; providing an effective date; and 
declaring an emergency . 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW    A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 11-103.6o of Title 70, unless 
there is created a duplication in numb ering, reads as follows: 
A.  Beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, the State Department 
of Education shall implement a four-year pilot program to provide 
courses and assessments in U nited States history, government , and   
 
 
Req. No. 2296 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
civics to eleventh-grade students enrolled in public school 
districts and public cha rter schools in this s tate. 
B.  The State Department of Educati on shall contract with a 
provider that will make online courses and assessments available to 
eleventh-grade students at no cost to the State Department of 
Education or participating public sc hool districts or public charter 
schools. The contracted provider shall make the following courses 
available: 
1.  Introduction to the United States Constitution; 
2.  The Meaning and History of t he United States Constitution; 
3.  The Progressive Rejection of the Founding Fathers and the 
Rise of Bureaucratic De spotism; 
4.  Civil Rights in American History; and 
5.  The Federalist Papers. 
C.  After completing the courses required by subsection B of 
this section, eleven th-grade students shall be administered an 
assessment on the conte nt of the courses. School districts and 
public charter schools shall submit assessment scores to the State 
Department of Education, which shall post the scores on its website 
in a manner that complies with the Student Dat a Accessibility, 
Transparency and Accountability Act of 2013 and the Family 
Educational Rights and Privacy Act (FERPA) . 
D.  The pilot program created in this section shall end no later 
than July 1, 2026.   
 
 
Req. No. 2296 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
E.  By November 30, 2026, the State Department of Education 
shall submit a report to the President Pro Tempore of the Senate and 
the Speaker of the House of Representatives cont aining an evaluation 
of the results of the pilot program.  The report shall include data 
on the number of students who score a bove and below seventy percent 
(70%) on the assessment requir ed by subsection C of this section. 
F.  The State Board of Education may promulgate rules t o 
implement the provisions of this se ction. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2022. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediatel y necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health , or safety, an emergency is her eby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof thi s act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
58-2-2296 EB 9/17/2021 1:22:11 PM