Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Weaver | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Standridge | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |