House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Manger (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Stanley |