Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1119 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 23, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 24, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2022

Amended

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022